Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1341 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 26, 2024
Bill January 25, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 15, 2024
Analysis April 3, 2024
Analysis March 21, 2024
Analysis March 18, 2024
Analysis February 27, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024