Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1358 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 3, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024