Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1359 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 1, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis May 31, 2024
Analysis May 9, 2024
Analysis May 7, 2024
Analysis March 27, 2024
Analysis March 21, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 27, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 30, 2024