Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1366 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 15, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 30, 2024
Analysis April 17, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024