LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1367
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona Senate Bill SB1367
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2024 Regular Session
Arizona Senate Bill SB1367
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 25, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 6, 2024
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
April 5, 2024
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
April 1, 2024
Analysis
March 27, 2024
Analysis
March 14, 2024
Analysis
March 11, 2024
Analysis
March 6, 2024
Analysis
February 8, 2024