Senate | 02/26/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-2-0) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |