Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1402 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 30, 2024
Analysis March 22, 2024
Analysis March 20, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024