Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1407 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis March 5, 2024
Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024