Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1408 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis March 4, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024