House
|
06/04/2024
|
House third reading FAILED voting: (24-36-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House refer to additional Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Assigned to House JUD Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Assigned to Senate JUD Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|