Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1456 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 13, 2024
Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024