Senate | 02/26/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-1-0) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-1-0) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |