Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1467 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 1, 2024
Analysis March 18, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024