House | 03/13/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Senate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-2-1-0) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |