Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1496 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 2, 2024
Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 29, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024