Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1506 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 1, 2024
Bill March 6, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 1, 2024
Analysis March 21, 2024
Analysis March 15, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024