|
04/16/2024
|
Governor Vetoed
|
|
|
|
04/10/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to House HHS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Assigned to Senate HHS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|