Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1571 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 10, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 5, 2024
Analysis March 28, 2024
Analysis March 22, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 27, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024