House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to House GOV Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Assigned to Senate GOV Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|