Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1583 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 5, 2024
Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 1, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 1, 2024
Analysis March 21, 2024
Analysis March 15, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis March 1, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024