Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1608 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 2, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 5, 2024
Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis March 19, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024