Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1609 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2024
Bill March 4, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis July 8, 2024
Analysis June 4, 2024
Analysis April 24, 2024
Analysis April 4, 2024
Analysis March 22, 2024
Analysis March 20, 2024
Analysis March 4, 2024
Analysis February 29, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 30, 2024