Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1611 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 5, 2024
Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024