Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1634 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024