Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1636 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Chaptered

Bill June 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis June 12, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024