Senate | 02/26/2024 | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-17-1-0) | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |