Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1665 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2024
Bill March 6, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis May 1, 2024
Analysis April 23, 2024
Analysis March 21, 2024
Analysis March 18, 2024
Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024