Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1673 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 25, 2024
Analysis April 23, 2024
Analysis April 4, 2024
Analysis April 3, 2024
Analysis March 26, 2024
Analysis March 20, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 27, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 24, 2024