Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1675 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 30, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 3, 2024