Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1748 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 12, 2024

Engrossed

Bill June 14, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis July 10, 2024
Analysis June 26, 2024
Analysis June 15, 2024
Analysis June 13, 2024