Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1749 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 12, 2024

Engrossed

Bill June 14, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis July 30, 2024
Analysis July 10, 2024
Analysis June 13, 2024