Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SCR1010 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 15, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 22, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024