Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SCR1020 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024