House | 03/20/2024 | House MOE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Assigned to House MOE Committee | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-1-0) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |