LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR1040
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona Senate Bill SCR1040
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2024 Regular Session
Arizona Senate Bill SCR1040
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 29, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 2, 2024
Compare
Bill
February 27, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
June 19, 2024
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
April 3, 2024
Analysis
March 22, 2024
Analysis
March 18, 2024
Analysis
February 12, 2024