Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SCR1041 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 29, 2024

Enrolled

Bill June 14, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis June 14, 2024
Analysis March 22, 2024
Analysis March 18, 2024
Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024