Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SCR1042 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 17, 2024
Analysis March 27, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis February 29, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024