Arizona 2025 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2314 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2025

Engrossed

Bill February 25, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis March 24, 2025
Analysis February 26, 2025
Analysis February 14, 2025
Analysis February 11, 2025