Senate
|
04/18/2025
|
Chapter 86
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2025
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
04/14/2025
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Assigned to Senate HHS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2025
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2025
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2025
|
House Committee of the Whole consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2025
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (12-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2025
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2025
|
Assigned to House HHS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2025
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|