Senate | 03/05/2025 | Senate PS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Assigned to Senate PS Committee | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/17/2025 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-26-1-0) | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | House RO Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (3-2-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Assigned to House RO Committee | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Introduced in House and read first time |