Arizona 2025 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2689 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2025

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis March 26, 2025
Analysis March 20, 2025
Analysis March 4, 2025
Analysis February 21, 2025
Analysis February 19, 2025
Analysis February 14, 2025