House
|
03/26/2025
|
House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (12-3-2-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
House LARA Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Assigned to House LARA Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-3-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2025
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Senate NR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Assigned to Senate NR Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|