Arizona 2025 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1463 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2025

Engrossed

Bill February 25, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis April 29, 2025
Analysis March 27, 2025
Analysis March 24, 2025
Analysis February 10, 2025