Arizona 2025 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1656 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis March 26, 2025
Analysis March 20, 2025
Analysis March 4, 2025
Analysis February 21, 2025
Analysis February 17, 2025