House | 03/13/2025 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Assigned to House NREW Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-4-3-0) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Senate NR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Assigned to Senate NR Committee | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |