|
09/28/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 417, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 6278.)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4491.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on EQ. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 6. Page 3814.)
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
From inactive file. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Portantino.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From Consent Calendar. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|