05/13/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
05/10/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/11/2009 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/02/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/01/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 1885.) | |||
05/29/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/29/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/22/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |||
04/14/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
04/13/2009 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |