|
08/30/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
From committee: That, pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10, the above measure be re-referred to the Com. on APPR pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Romero.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2056.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Padilla. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2062.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1746.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|