|
05/24/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 30. Page 1936.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|