|
08/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 187, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:55 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6098.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4373.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1369.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|